|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5916.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3417.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3237.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|