|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 863, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4806.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6299.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6127.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3592.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 8.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|