Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3211.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2014 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |