Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 3664.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3713.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3296.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|