Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3121.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |