California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1261 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill August 7, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014