Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5998.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 7.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5690.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3659.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3713.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3344.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3211.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|