|
09/19/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4939.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 6451.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6339.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3642.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3340.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|