Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3342.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3093.) (April 8). | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |