|
09/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 530, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 4951.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6547.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6344.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3608.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3713.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3342.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3039.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|