Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3313.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2014 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |