Assembly | 06/24/2014 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2014 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 3608.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3714.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3218.) (April 22). | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2014 | Set for hearing March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |