Senate | 05/05/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2014 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |