LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1288
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1288
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1288
Action History
Senate
04/21/2014
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3217.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
04/09/2014
Set for hearing April 21.
Senate
03/06/2014
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
Senate
02/24/2014
Read first time.
Senate
02/23/2014
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
Senate
02/21/2014
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.