Senate | 04/29/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |