LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1290
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1290
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1290
Action History
Senate
05/01/2014
Hearing postponed by committee.
Senate
03/27/2014
Set for hearing May 7.
Senate
03/06/2014
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Senate
02/24/2014
Read first time.
Senate
02/22/2014
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
Senate
02/21/2014
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.