Senate | 04/22/2014 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3234.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |