Assembly | 06/24/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2014 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 3592.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3344.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |