|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 842, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4731.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 6230.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3690.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3714.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3344.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3258.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|