07/21/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2014. | |||
07/21/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/09/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 5810.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 3046.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3019.) (April 1). | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |