California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1310 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 07/21/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1310CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 174 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 21, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 21, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 3, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 3, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lara FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Section 18.5 to the Penal Code, relating to misdemeanors. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1310, Lara. Misdemeanors: maximum sentence. Existing law defines a crime or public offense as an act committed or omitted in violation of a law forbidding or commanding it, and to which is annexed, upon conviction, specified punishments, including, among others, imprisonment. Under existing law, a crime that is punishable by imprisonment in a county jail for a period not to exceed a year is a misdemeanor. Existing law includes many misdemeanors with specified punishments permitting confinement in a county jail not to exceed one year. This bill would require that every offense punishable by imprisonment in a county jail up to or not exceeding one year be punishable by imprisonment not to exceed 364 days. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18.5 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 18.5. Every offense which is prescribed by any law of the state to be punishable by imprisonment in a county jail up to or not exceeding one year shall be punishable by imprisonment in a county jail for a period not to exceed 364 days.