09/16/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 374, Statutes of 2014. | |||
09/16/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 09/04/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6647.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3491.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3237.) (April 22). | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |