California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1314 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2014

Amended

Bill June 19, 2014
Bill June 4, 2014
Bill May 7, 2014