Senate | 04/24/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3257.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2014 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |