Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3279.) (April 28). | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |