Senate | 04/24/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 8. Page 3282.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2014 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |