California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1337 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 8, 2014

Amended

Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill April 3, 2014