|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4645.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6193.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3659.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3714.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3281.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|