07/07/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2014. | |||
07/07/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/30/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5698.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 17). | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3267.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3162.) (April 9). | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |