Senate | 05/06/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |