Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3214.) (April 22). | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |