Assembly | 06/12/2014 | Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to L. Gov.) suspended. (Page 5488.) | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3468.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 5). | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3215.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |