Assembly | 06/25/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3686.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3715.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3036.) (April 2). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |