|
09/19/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 8. Page 6404.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3535.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|