Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3717.) (May 27). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3575.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2014
|
Set for hearing May 27 in B. & F.I. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3403.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3162.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|