California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill June 13, 2014

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2014

Amended

Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 25, 2014