|
09/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 322, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4605.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6124.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and AGRI. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3326.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3278.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|