Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3218.) (April 22). | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |