Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3310.) (April 29). | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3281.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Set for hearing April 29 in JUD. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2014 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |