BILL NUMBER: SB 1358AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 5, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 4, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 5, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 28, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senators Wolk and Lara (Coauthors: Senators Corbett and Padilla) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Garcia) FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Section 18941.11 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1358, as amended, Wolk. Building standards: baby diaper changing stations. The California Building Standards Law provides for the adoption of building standards by state agencies by requiring all state agencies that adopt or propose adoption of any building standard to submit building standards to the California Building Standards Commission for approval and adoption. In the absence of a designated state agency, the commission is required to adopt specific building standards, as prescribed. Existing law requires the commission to publish, or cause to be published, editions of the California Building Standards Code in its entirety once every 3 years. This bill would require the commission, commencing with the next triennial edition of the California Building Standards Code adopted after January 1, 2015, to adopt, approve, codify, and publish mandatory building standards for the installation of baby diaper changing accommodations in restroom facilities inplaces of public accommodation,public use spaces, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18941.11 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 18941.11. (a) The commission shall, commencing with the next triennial edition of the California Building Standards Code (Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations) adopted after January 1, 2015, adopt, approve, codify, and publish mandatory building standards for the installation of baby diaper changing accommodations in restroom facilities inplaces of public accommodationpublic use areas . These building standards shall apply to newly constructed restrooms and to renovated restrooms for which the renovation requires a building permit and the value of the renovation to the restroom exceeds ten thousand dollars ($10,000). (b) The commission may expend funds from the Building Standards Administration Special Revolving Fund, upon appropriation pursuant to Section 18931.7, for the development and the adoption of these standards. (c) For purposes of this section, "public use area" means interior or exterior rooms, spaces, or elements that are made available to the public.