California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1358 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Amended

Bill August 25, 2014
Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 5, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill May 5, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014