Senate | 05/29/2014 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hancock. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 16. Page 3614.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hancock. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3614.) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3715.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |