Assembly | 08/30/2013 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2013 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2013 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1096.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1007.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 485.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |