Senate | 04/08/2014 | Set, first hearing. Heard for testimony only. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W., E.Q., and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |