Senate | 06/24/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2014 | Set for hearing June 24. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Re-referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |