|
09/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 441, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4911.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6489.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6342.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3437.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|