Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 16. Page 3702.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 3667.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Evans. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3668.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3715.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3235.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and AGRI. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2992.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, AGRI., and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|