California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 30, 2014