|
06/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2019.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 608.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 404.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|