Assembly | 06/25/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2014 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3611.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3716.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3212.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |